06/06/1985 |
Drafted in the 1985 first-year player draft out of high school (Florien; Florien, LA) by the Pittsburgh Pirates (Round 16, Pick 12, 500th overall pick). |
01/01/1986 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (25); Power: 25 (30); Eye: 45 (50). |
01/01/1987 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (25); Power: 25 (25); Eye: 40 (50). |
06/07/1987 |
Released by the Pittsburgh organization. |
06/12/1987 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Sacramento River Cats organization. |
01/01/1988 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (30); Power: 30 (30); Eye: 45 (45). |
06/23/1988 |
Was selected to the 1988 South Atlantic League All-Star Game. |
09/13/1988 |
Wins the 1988 Northwest League Championship Series with the Salem-Keizer Volcanoes! |
01/01/1989 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (30); Power: 30 (30); Eye: 50 (50). |
05/15/1989 |
Wins the SAL SAL Player of the Week Award. |
01/01/1990 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (30); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 50 (50). |
01/01/1991 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (40); Eye: 50 (50). |
11/21/1991 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $500,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/1992 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 50 (50). |
11/28/1992 |
Received a 1-year contract worth a total of $500,000 through automatic renewal. |
01/01/1993 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 40 (40); Eye: 50 (50). |
04/11/1993 |
Was claimed off waivers by Los Angeles while with San Francisco. |
11/24/1993 |
Became a free agent. |
01/01/1994 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 45 (50). |
05/19/1994 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Tallahassee Rebels organization. |
11/26/1994 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1995 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 50 (50). |
06/01/1995 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Rome Braves organization. |
11/26/1995 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1996 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 50 (50). |
06/20/1996 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Edmonton Drillers organization. |
11/03/1996 |
Released by the Miami organization. |
01/01/1997 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 50 (50). |
06/20/1997 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Danville Braves organization. |
11/29/1997 |
Became a minor league free agent. |
01/01/1998 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 50 (50). |
06/20/1998 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Calgary Cannons organization. |
11/05/1998 |
Released by the Montreal organization. |
01/01/1999 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 45 (50). |
06/20/1999 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract with the Miami (GCL) Marlins organization. |
11/05/1999 |
Released by the Miami organization. |
01/01/2000 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 45 (50). |
01/01/2001 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (35); Power: 35 (35); Eye: 45 (50). |
01/01/2001 |
Retired from professional baseball. |